IL HB0706 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the program of health benefits may offer as an alternative, available on an optional basis, coverage through health maintenance organizations or other managed care programs. Provides that the election to participate in a program of health benefits under the Act must be made during the annual benefit choice period or upon showing a qualifying change in status as defined in the U.S. Internal Revenue Code. Further modifies the conditions of eligibility to participate in a program of health benefits. Provides that refunds to members for premiums paid for optional life insurance coverage may be paid from the Group Insurance Premium Fund. Makes other changes concerning a program of health benefits as provided under the Act. Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Central Management Services to prepare a report showing, on a fiscal year by fiscal year basis, the amount by which the State's cost for health insurance coverage under the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 for retirees of the State's universities and their survivors has declined as a result of requiring some of those retirees and survivors to contribute to the cost of their basic health insurance. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
STATE EMPLOYEE GROUP INSURANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0019 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 105-001-002 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-158.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |