IL HB0705 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Underground Natural Gas Storage Safety Act. Provides that, in the case of a verified facility leak, the owner and operator of the underground natural gas storage facility is responsible for specified actions. Defines "verified facility leak". Effective immediately.
Title
NATURAL GAS-VERIFIED LEAKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 022-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 029-000-000 |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 160 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 160 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |