IL HB0701 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a license required to engage in the business of making loans of money in a principal amount not exceeding $40,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback