IL HB0692 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall develop an appropriate licensing and monitoring system that recognizes the unique population and programming for youth served by the Comprehensive Community-Based Youth Services program. Provides that the Department shall maintain licensing staff who are knowledgeable of Comprehensive Community-Based Youth Services program standards, as set forth by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall be responsible for the development and implementation of a training curriculum for host homes that recognizes the unique population and programming of youth served in Comprehensive Community-Based Youth Services. Provides that host homes licensed by the Department shall not be utilized for a child who is a youth in care of the Department. Defines "host homes". Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
CHILD CARE ACT-HOST HOMES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0688 |
2021-12-17 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2021-12-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-11-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 20, 2021 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Health |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-05-04 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 2.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 3.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |