IL HB0692 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a rental company shall not charge a renter any fee, surcharge, or fine amount that is more than twice the toll amount charged to the rental company's I-Pass or E-ZPass account for the renter's use of the rental vehicle on a toll highway operated by the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-RENTAL COMPANY-IPASS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-305Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback