IL HB0684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Officer Prohibited Activities Act. Provides that a unit of local government with taxing authority, or any person holding public office with that unit of local government, shall not use public resources or public funds to obstruct, fight, or challenge initiatives to consolidate, merge, or eliminate any unit of local government. Provides that State moneys shall be withheld from the unit of local government until the obstruction, fighting, or challenge is concluded.
Title
PUBLIC OFFICE-PROHIBITED ACTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 105 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 105 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |