IL HB0659 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning resource recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2017
2017-05-17SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70260556Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback