IL HB0646 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that the name, address, phone number, or other personally identifying information of a recipient of a prize may not be disclosed without the consent of the recipient and shall be exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the awarding of a prize may not be conditioned upon disclosure of the identity of the recipient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY WINNER PRIVACY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-02-24HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016057.18New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback