IL HB0601 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that specified requirements also apply to opioid treatment programs that are licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services' Division of Substance Use Prevention and Recovery and are authorized by the federal Drug Enforcement Administration to prescribe Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substances for the treatment of opioid use disorders. Requires opioid treatment programs to attempt to obtain written patient consent, document attempts to obtain the written consent, and not transmit information without patient consent. Provides that the documentation obtained shall not be utilized for law enforcement purposes. Provides that treatment of a patient shall not be conditioned upon his or her written consent. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PMP-OPIOID TREATMENT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Special Session in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2021-08-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 19, 2021
2021-08-31SenateSecond Reading
2021-08-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading August 31, 2021
2021-08-26SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-08-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-05-21SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-05SenatePostponed - Health
2021-04-28SenateAssigned to Health
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-21SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-21SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2021-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570316Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback