IL HB0567 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a resident of a community-integrated living arrangement, as defined by rule of the State Board of Elections, is a resident, for voting purposes, of the election jurisdiction in which the arrangement is located.
Title
ELECTIONS-COMMUNITY INTEGRATED
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Careen Gordon [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0563 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-14 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass as Amended Elections; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Elections | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Elections | |
2009-04-21 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 005-001-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Careen M. Gordon |