IL HB0503 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates President Barack Obama's date of birth, August 4, as a legal holiday on which to hold appropriate exercises in commemoration of him. Includes that when the day falls on a Sunday, the following Monday shall be held and considered the holiday. Amends the Election Code, the Illinois Procurement Code, the School Code, and the Promissory Note and Bank Holiday Act to include Barack Obama's birthday as a holiday. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE HOLIDAY-OBAMA BIRTHDAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 630 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 490 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |