IL HB0490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall require a drug test to screen each individual who applies for Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF), and that subject to federal approval, the Department shall require a drug test to screen each individual who applies for benefits under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP). Contains provisions concerning notice; persons required to comply with the drug testing requirements; persons exempt from the drug testing requirements; reimbursements for the cost of the drug testing; and other matters. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-TANF-DRUG SCREENING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.50New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback