IL HB0453 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Financial Transaction Tax Act. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
FINANCIAL TRANSACT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Re-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |