IL HB0445 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. With respect to the 5 State-funded Retirement Systems: requires each System to prepare and implement a Tier 3 plan by July 1, 2018 that aggregates State and employee contributions in individual participant accounts which are used for payouts after retirement. Provides that a Tier 1 or Tier 2 participant may irrevocably elect to participate in the Tier 3 plan instead of the defined benefit plan; makes conforming changes. Authorizes a Tier 1 or Tier 2 participant who elects to participate in the Tier 3 plan to elect to terminate all participation in the defined benefit plan and to have a specified amount credited to his or her account under the Tier 3 plan. Provides that the Tier 3 plan supersedes the defined contribution plan created under P.A. 98-599 for certain Tier 1 participants. Requires each System to report on its progress in establishing the Tier 3 plan to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 15, 2018. Provides that "new benefit increase" does not include any benefit increase resulting from the changes made by the amendatory Act. In the Downstate Teachers, State Employees, and State Universities Articles, authorizes a person to elect not to participate or to terminate his or her participation in those Systems. In the General Assembly and Judges Articles, authorizes a participant to terminate his or her participation in the System. Makes related changes in the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code) and the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-STATE SYS-TIER 3 PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=445&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0445.htm |