IL HB0426 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Immigration Safe Zones Act. Provides that schools, medical treatment and health care facilities, and places of worship may not grant access to State and local law enforcement agencies that have entered into an agreement with United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement or undertake other joint efforts with federal, State, or local law enforcement agencies to investigate, detain, or arrest individuals for violation of federal immigration law, unless a court has issued a warrant and appropriate personnel have reviewed that warrant and have consented to access or unless required by law and appropriate personnel have consented. Prohibits employees of elementary and secondary schools and institutions of higher education from asking about a student's immigration status or that of the student's family members, with exceptions. Requires the Department of Human Services to provide training or make training available to teachers, administrators, and other staff of elementary and secondary schools, as well as to medical treatment and health care facilities, on how to deal with immigration issues and how to notify families of those issues in multiple languages. Requires appropriate personnel of a facility to develop a plan to provide assistance, information, and safety to persons who are concerned about the government's immigration enforcement efforts. Provides for the removal of certain file information by State agencies, public schools, and public institutions of higher education. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
IMMIGRATION SAFE ZONES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-005-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-01-31 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |