IL HB0401 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that as a condition of parole and mandatory supervised release the subject, if convicted for an offense that would qualify the accused as a sex offender under the Sex Offender Registration Act on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, shall wear an approved electronic monitoring device that has Global Positioning System (GPS) capability for the duration of the person's natural life.
Title
CD CORR-SUPERVISED RELEASE-GPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-08-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-02-26 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=401&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0401.htm |