IL HB0399 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the High-Speed Railway Commission Act. Prescribes the membership of the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall create a statewide plan for a high-speed rail line and feeder network connecting St. Louis, Missouri and Chicago, Illinois that includes current existing Amtrak and Metra services, connects the cities of Rockford, Moline, Peoria, and Decatur, and uses inter-city bus service to coordinate with the rail line. Provides that the Commission shall conduct a ridership study and shall make findings and recommendations concerning a governance structure, the frequency of service, and implementation of the plan. Provides that the Commission shall report to the General Assembly and the Governor no later than December 31 of each year. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall provide administrative support to the Commission. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2027. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGH SPEED RAILWAY COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
2021-05-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 019-000-000
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2021-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 101-007-000
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-08HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2021-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2021-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback