IL HB0399 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that a petition for an order of protection may be filed by the State's Attorney on behalf of a person who has been abused by a family or household member. Provides that the court may, on its own motion, on behalf of a person who has been abused by a family or household member issue an order of protection. Lengthens duration of plenary order of protection in a criminal case to no longer than 10 years after sentence completion (rather than 2 years).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECTION ORDER-ISSUANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-19HouseTo General Law Subcommittee
2015-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2015-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2015-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2015-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255112A-20Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-4Amended CodeCitation Text
75060201Amended CodeCitation Text
75060220Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback