IL HB0396 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Youth Wrestling Fund. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue Illinois Youth Wrestling Plates. Charges $40 for the issuance of these plates, $25 of which will go to the Illinois Youth Wrestling Fund and $15 of which will go to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Charges $27 for renewal, $25 of which will go to the Illinois Youth Wrestling Fund and $2 of which will go to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Allows distribution of money in the Illinois Youth Wrestling Fund for wrestling-related programming grants and scholarships.
Title
VEH-CD YOUTH WRESTLING PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | To Transportation: License Plates Subcommittee |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | To Transportation: License Plates Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.866 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=396&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0396.htm |