IL HB0396 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department's powers and duties.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-12-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2011 |
2011-11-10 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2011 |
2011-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-10-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=396&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0396.htm |