IL HB0395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall refuse to issue a REAL ID compliant identification card to any person who has been issued a REAL ID compliant driver's license under the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person may surrender a REAL ID compliant driver's license in order to become eligible to obtain a REAL ID compliant identification card. Provides that the Secretary may issue both REAL ID compliant identification cards and non-compliant identification cards, and may permit applicants to designate which type of identification card they wish to receive. Provides that all provisions applicable to non-compliant identification cards shall also apply to REAL ID compliant identification cards, except where the provisions are inconsistent with the REAL ID Act and implementing regulations. Requires the Secretary to establish by rule the date on which issuance of REAL ID compliant identification cards will begin. Provides for the issuance of confidential identification cards as either REAL ID compliant identification cards or non-compliant identification cards. Provides that every identification card or Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Card issued to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident shall be marked "Limited Term" and shall expire, if the earliest among other potential expiration dates, one year from the date of issuance of a Limited Term REAL ID compliant identification card. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to make similar changes concerning issuance of driver's licenses. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ID COMPLIANT CARDS
Sponsors
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0248 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-006-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-007-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 1A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 4D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-100.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |