IL HB0394 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Secretary of State Act. Provides that the Secretary of State is authorized to solicit and accept sponsorship for publications printed and distributed by the Secretary's office. Provides that the Secretary shall not solicit or accept applications or enter into a sponsorship agreement with certain specified persons or entities. Establishes requirements and procedures for sponsorship of publications. Requires that all funds received by the Secretary for sponsorship of publications shall be deposited into the Secretary of State's Grant Fund. Provides that the Secretary shall adopt rules under the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act as necessary for the implementation of publication sponsorship. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-PUBLICATION SPONSORSHIP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0335 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |