IL HB0378 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of Volunteer Firefighter plates. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $27 for original issuance of the plates, of which $12 shall be deposited into the Fire Prevention Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $17 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $15 shall be deposited into the Fire Prevention Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.
Title
VEH CD-VOL FIREFIGHTER PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Tabled |
2015-03-19 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=378&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0378.htm |