IL HB0345 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Prohibits the sale or furnishing of tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, or alternative nicotine products to a person under 21 years of age. Prohibits the purchase of tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, or alternative nicotine products by a person under 21 years of age. Makes changes regarding definitions, age verification, penalties, possession, and other matters. Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends other Acts to make conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0002 |
2019-04-08 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-001 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-031-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-001-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 1.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | Act title | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 680 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 685 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 685 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |