IL HB0326 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that 30 days after the effective date of the bill, the Department of Transportation shall conduct a study evaluating automated traffic law enforcement systems. Provides that on or before December 31, 2019, the Department shall file a report with the General Assembly with the results from the study, including input from local law enforcement, and any recommendations the Department deems necessary. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-RED LIGHT CAMERA STUDY
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-10-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=326&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0326.htm |