IL HB0300 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Specifies that the provision that requires an employer to make an additional contribution to the System for certain salary increases greater than 6% excludes salary increases necessary to bring a school board in compliance with the changes to the minimum salary provisions of the School Code under Public Act 101-443 or the amendatory Act. Amends the Employment of Teachers Article of the School Code. In the provisions concerning minimum salary, removes a provision subjecting the increase in the minimum salary rate to review by the General Assembly. Provides that the minimum salary rate for a school year shall be increased by a percentage equal to the annualized percentage increase (instead of the percentage increase), if any, in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for all items published by the United States Department of Labor for the 12-month period ending on June 30 of the school year that ended 12 months prior to the school year in which the adjusted salary is to be in effect (instead of for the previous school year). Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability shall certify and publish the minimum salary rate to be used. Removes a provision regarding the Professional Review Panel submitting a report to the General Assembly on how State funds and funds distributed under the evidence-based funding formula may aid the financial effects of certain changes. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0515 |
2023-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2023 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-012-000 |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-04-25 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 145 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |