IL HB0296 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that 30 days after the effective date of the bill, the Department of Transportation shall conduct a study evaluating automated traffic law enforcement systems in this State. Provides that on or before December 31, 2019, the Department shall file a report with the General Assembly with the results from the study, including input from local law enforcement, and any recommendations the Department deems necessary. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-RED LIGHT CAMERA STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback