IL HB0280 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, instead of a distinctive electric vehicle registration plate, the Secretary may require an electric vehicle decal to be displayed on any registration plate otherwise available for motor vehicles of the same class as the electric vehicle.
Title
ELECTRIC VEHICLE REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=280&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0280.htm |