IL HB0277 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, whenever a person fails to appear in court and the court continues the case, if the clerk of the court elects to establish a system to send text, email, and telephone notifications, the clerk of the court may send notifications to an email address, may send a text message to the person's last known cellular telephone number, and if the person does not have a cellular telephone number, may reach the person at the person's last known landline telephone number regarding the continued court date. Deletes a provision that requires a court to enter an order of failure to appear if a person does not appear in court on or before the continued court date or satisfy the court that the person's appearance in and surrender to the court is impossible for no fault of the person. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Deletes language providing that an offender who defaults in the payment of a fine or any installment of that fine may be held in contempt and imprisoned for nonpayment and that the court may issue a summons for his or her appearance or a warrant of arrest.
Title
COURTS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-038-002 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-005-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 22 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |