IL HB0259 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Isolated Confinement Restriction Act. Restricts the use of isolated confinement in correctional facilities in the State. Provides that a committed person shall not be placed in isolated confinement unless there is reasonable cause to believe that the committed person would create a substantial risk of immediate serious harm to himself, herself, or another, and a less restrictive intervention would be insufficient to reduce this risk and the correctional facility shall bear the burden of establishing this standard. Provides that a committed person shall not be placed in isolated confinement before receiving a personal and comprehensive medical and mental health examination conducted by a clinician. Defines "clinician" as: (1) a physician who is licensed to practice medicine in all of its branches and is certified in psychiatry by the American Board of Psychiatry and Neurology or the American Osteopathic Board of Neurology and Psychiatry, or has completed 4 years of an accredited post-graduate training program in psychiatry; or (2) a licensed clinical psychologist. Provides that a committed person held in emergency confinement shall receive an initial medical and mental health evaluation within 2 hours. Establishes conditions in which a committed person may be placed in protective custody. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018, except that the Department of Corrections rules provisions are effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISOLATED CONFINEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-004-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; 008-003-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-02-23HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-19HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-8-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback