IL HB0241 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that pre-licensing course of study hours required to be completed in a classroom setting in order to obtain an insurance producer license may also be completed in a webinar setting. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-EDUCATION BY WEBINAR
Sponsors
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 500-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |