IL HB0221 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a report of any disposition of court supervision for a violation of an offense defined as a serious traffic violation under the Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance shall be forwarded to the Secretary of State (previously, report restricted to a serious traffic violation committed by a person under 21 years of age). Provides that a clerk of court shall immediately forward (rather than forward within 5 days after disposition) to the Secretary a disposition of court supervision for any traffic violation, except for certain violations under the Code.
Title
VEH CD-REPORT SUPERVISION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=221&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0221.htm |