IL HB0221 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a physician or other health care professional who provides services through a hospital that is a member of a preferred provider organization to an insured person who is admitted to the hospital and participates in the preferred provider organization may not use any fee schedule other than that set forth by the insurer for the preferred provider organization.
Title
INS CD-PPO HOSP PROVIDER FEE
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=221&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0221.htm |