IL HB0211 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to conduct at least one workshop and issue a report concerning whether the development, construction, and installation of new publicly-accessible electric vehicle charging stations would increase utilization of electric vehicles by the citizens of this State. Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ICC-REPORT-ELEC VEHICLES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-06HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-108.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback