IL HB0190 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for its FY14 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
$DFPR-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0001 |
2013-02-07 | House | Effective Date February 7, 2013 |
2013-02-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-02-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-015-000 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Added as Co-Sponsor - Senator Rezin |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 012-005-000 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Motion Prevailed 037-015-000 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senator Rose request a Roll Call on Waiving the Posting Requirements |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Motion Filed Sen. Dan Kotowski; Waive Posting Requirements |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-02-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-052-001 |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted 066-046-002 |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 (M1) Moved to Reconsider the Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-02-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-002-000 |
2013-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |