IL HB0140 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0289 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 15 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |