IL HB0124 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that persons appointed to be a Department of State Police officer shall, at the time of their appointment, be not less than 21 years of age, or 20 years of age and have successfully completed an associate's degree or 60 credit hours at an accredited college or university (rather than 2 years of law enforcement studies at an accredited college or university).
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0374 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 160 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |