IL HB0120 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Requires the Task Force to assess ways the State can improve the rate at which disability compensation claims are approved by the federal government and correct the disparity between the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs' approval of disability compensation for Illinois veterans and that which is approved for veterans in other states. Provides that 4 members of different Illinois counties' Veterans Assistance Commissions, Veteran Service Officers, and VITAS officials shall be appointed to serve on the Task Force by the chair of the Veterans' Affairs Committee in the House of Representatives and the chair of the Veterans Affairs Committee in the Senate. Requires the report to be submitted by December 31, 2020 (rather than 2019) and the Task Force to dissolve and the amendatory Act's provisions to be repealed on December 31, 2021 (rather than 2020).
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0225 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |