IL HB0120 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Requires the Task Force to assess ways the State can improve the rate at which disability compensation claims are approved by the federal government and correct the disparity between the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs' approval of disability compensation for Illinois veterans and that which is approved for veterans in other states. Provides that 4 members of different Illinois counties' Veterans Assistance Commissions, Veteran Service Officers, and VITAS officials shall be appointed to serve on the Task Force by the chair of the Veterans' Affairs Committee in the House of Representatives and the chair of the Veterans Affairs Committee in the Senate. Requires the report to be submitted by December 31, 2020 (rather than 2019) and the Task Force to dissolve and the amendatory Act's provisions to be repealed on December 31, 2021 (rather than 2020).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0225
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2019-04-23SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-02HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51401.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=120&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0225.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0120sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0120_04042019_033000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0120_05232019_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0120sam002_05292019_004001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0120sam001_05292019_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback