IL HB0109 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for its FY18 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DNR-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-001
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-005-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-05HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-05HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback