IL HB0094 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall award sentence credit accumulated prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act for participation in full-time substance abuse programs, correctional industry assignments, educational programs, behavior modification programs, life skills courses, or re-entry planning provided by the Department of Corrections in an amount specified in this provision to an inmate serving a sentence for an offense committed prior to June 19, 1998, if the Department determines that the inmate is entitled to this sentence credit, based upon: (1) documentation provided by the Department that the inmate engaged in any full-time substance abuse programs, correctional industry assignments, educational programs, behavior modification programs, life skills courses, or re-entry planning provided by the Department and satisfactorily completed the assigned program as determined by the standards of the Department during the inmate's current term of incarceration; or (2) the inmate's own testimony in the form of an affidavit or documentation, or a third party's documentation or testimony in the form of an affidavit that the inmate likely engaged in any full-time substance abuse programs, correctional industry assignments, educational programs, behavior modification programs, life skills courses, or re-entry planning provided by the Department and satisfactorily completed the assigned program as determined by the standards of the Department during the inmate's current term of incarceration. Provides that if the inmate can provide documentation that he or she is entitled to sentence credit under this provision in excess of 45 days of participation in those programs, the inmate shall receive 90 days of sentence credit. Provides that if the inmate cannot provide documentation of more than 45 days of participation in those programs, the inmate shall receive 45 days of sentence credit. Provides that in the event of a disagreement between the Department and the inmate as to the amount of credit under this provision accumulated, if the Department provides documented proof of a lesser amount of days of participation in those programs, that proof shall control. Provides that if the Department provides no documentary proof, the inmate's proof as set forth in this provision shall control as to the amount of sentence credit provided. Provides that if the inmate has been convicted of a sex offense as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act, sentencing credits under this provision shall be awarded by the Department only if the inmate successfully completed or is participating in sex offender treatment as defined by the Sex Offender Management Board. Provides that no inmate serving a term of natural life imprisonment shall receive sentence credit under this provision. Provides that sentence credits for specified offenses and purposes do not apply if the prisoner is required to serve 100% of his or her sentence (rather than not applying if the prisoner is serving a sentence for first degree murder or terrorism). Provides that under certain restrictions and exceptions an additional 180 days of sentence credit shall be awarded to any prisoner who obtains a bachelor's degree or who obtains a master's or professional degree while the prisoner is committed to the Department of Corrections.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 63 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0440 |
2019-08-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 063-052-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-047-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |