IL HB0066 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2022, no recipient of medical assistance shall be required to enroll or transition to the State's managed care medical assistance program. Provides that any recipient enrolled in a managed care health plan on January 1, 2022 shall be given the option to disenroll from the State's managed care medical assistance program and receive coverage under the State's fee-for-service program. Provides that on and after January 1, 2022, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not enter into any new contract or agreement with a managed care organization (MCO) to provide services where payment for medical services is made on a capitated basis. Provides that the Department shall not renew, renter, renegotiate, change orders, or amend any contract or agreement it entered into with an MCO that was solicited under a specified request for proposals. Provides that any recipient who is enrolled in a managed care health plan administered by an MCO that entered a contract with the Department under a specified request for proposals shall be transitioned to the State's fee-for-service program upon the expiration of the MCO's contract with the Department. Requires the Department to establish, by rule, an appeals and grievance process that includes: an expedited internal review of an appeal involving an adverse determination; a final adverse determination; and a standard external review. Requires the Department to notify a recipient in writing of the recipient's right to request an external review. Repeals a provision concerning procurement requirements for MCO contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-END MANAGED CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-05HouseTo Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-30.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
30555-41New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-42New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback