IL HB0045 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various Acts and Codes. Changes all statutory references of alderman and aldermen to alderperson and alderpersons. Changes all statutory references of congressman to congressperson. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENDER NEUTRAL STATUTORY REF

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-03-03HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10510-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10523-6.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-26Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-28Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-10Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-210Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-230Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-235Amended CodeCitation Text
23554-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-11Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-2Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-230Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-109Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-113Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-232Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-243Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-243.2Amended CodeCitation Text
41070555-28Amended CodeCitation Text
501051Amended CodeCitation Text
501051.3Amended CodeCitation Text
501052Amended CodeCitation Text
501054Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-14036Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-610Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-14Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-22Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-23Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-24Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-25Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-26Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-27Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-28Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-29Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-30Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-32Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-33Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-34Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-38Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-39Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-40Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-41Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-5.1Amended CodeCitation Text
652021-7Amended CodeCitation Text
6520prec. Sec. 21-22Amended CodeCitation Text
6551-1-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-1-30Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-3-5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-101-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-10Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-14Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-80-5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-91-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6552-2-9Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-30Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-50Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-51Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-60Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-65Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-75Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-15Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-25Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-30Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-35Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-40Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-10Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-15Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-20Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-22Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-25Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-30Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-35Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-40Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-45Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-25-70Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-25-75Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-35-35Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-10Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-15Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-25Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-30Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-35Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-40Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-50Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-40-55Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-45-15Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-45-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-55-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6554-1-2Amended CodeCitation Text
6554-10-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-1-4Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-11Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-12Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-17Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-18Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-18.1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-18.2Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-18.7Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-19Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-2Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-3Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-4Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-7Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-2-8Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-3Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-4Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-7Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-3-8Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-4-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-5-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6555-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-10Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-2Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-3Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-4Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-6Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-7Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-8Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-3-9Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-4-4Amended CodeCitation Text
6556-5-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-1-15Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-1-39Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-1-42Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-2-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-2-19Amended CodeCitation Text
6557-2-28Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text
70121023Amended CodeCitation Text
70121525Amended CodeCitation Text
70200210-20Amended CodeCitation Text
70200210-25Amended CodeCitation Text
70200270-20Amended CodeCitation Text
70200270-25Amended CodeCitation Text
702105.6Amended CodeCitation Text
7026054.25Amended CodeCitation Text
7075510Amended CodeCitation Text
735515-1503Amended CodeCitation Text
7658251Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback