IL HB0008 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Medicare for All Health Care Act. Provides that all individuals residing in the State are covered under the Illinois Health Services Program for health insurance. Sets forth the health coverage benefits that participants are entitled to under the Program. Sets forth the qualification requirements for participating health providers. Sets forth standards for provider reimbursement. Provides that it is unlawful for private health insurers to sell health insurance coverage that duplicates the coverage of the Program. Provides that investor-ownership of health delivery facilities is unlawful. Provides that the State shall establish the Illinois Health Services Trust to provide financing for the Program. Sets forth the requirements for claims billing under the Program. Provides that the Program shall include funding for long-term care services and mental health services. Provides that the Program shall establish a single prescription drug formulary and list of approved durable medical goods and supplies. Creates the Pharmaceutical and Durable Medical Goods Committee to negotiate the prices of pharmaceuticals and durable medical goods with suppliers or manufacturers on an open bid competitive basis. Sets forth provisions concerning patients' rights. Provides that the employees of the Program shall be compensated in accordance with the current pay scale for State employees and as deemed professionally appropriate by the General Assembly. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
MEDICARE FOR ALL HEALTH CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-005-000 |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=8&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0008.htm |