IL HB0002 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Includes the Village of Crete among the municipalities in Cook County or Will County in which a standardbred racetrack may be located. Removes provisions restricting the racetrack from being located within 35 miles of another organization license. Amends the Illinois Gambling Act. Includes the Village of Crete among the municipalities in Cook County or Will County in which a casino may be located. Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take proceedings may be used for a period of no more than 24 months after the effective date by the Village of Crete for the nullification of any restriction of record on private real property by means of a recorded deed or other recorded instruments that in any way prohibits, restrains, or has any impact whatsoever on private real property for the purpose of applying for an organization license under the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 or an owners license under the Illinois Gambling Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-VILLAGE OF CRETE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 19.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 30 | 25-5-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0002.htm |