ID SJR101 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Proposes an amendment to the Idaho Constitution prohibiting the production, manufacture, transportation, sale, delivery, dispensing, distribution, possession, or use of certain psychoactive drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to the Idaho Constitution prohibiting the production, manufacture, transportation, sale, delivery, dispensing, distribution, possession, or use of certain psychoactive drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-04HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-03Senateto House
2021-02-03SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-03SenateRead third time in full -- ADOPTED 24-11-0
2021-02-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-01-29SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-19SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback