ID SJR101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RIGHTS OF CRIME VICTIMS -- Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.
Title
Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- ADOPTED 25-9-1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |