ID SJM105 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to reexamine, reform and reauthorize the Endangered Species Act, the National Environmental Policy Act, the Equal Access to Justice Act and any other federal law that disrespects the role of states and local governments in land management decisions and leads to costly and frivolous lawsuits that strip authority from Congress and place it in the hands of the judiciary.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to reexamine, reform and reauthorize the Endangered Species Act, the National Environmental Policy Act, the Equal Access to Justice Act and any other federal law that disrespects the role of states and local governments in land management decisions and leads to costly and frivolous lawsuits that strip authority from Congress and place it in the hands of the judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/28 | |
2012-03-28 | To Secretary of State | |
2012-03-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-27 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-26 | To enrol | |
2012-03-23 | to Senate | |
2012-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 57-10-3 | |
2012-03-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Env | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | House intro | |
2012-03-05 | to House | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | Lodge | |
2012-03-05 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-05 | ADOPTED | |
2012-03-05 | 10th Ord | |
2012-03-02 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-01 | to printing | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro |