ID SCR120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - To Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - To Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to rules governing plumbing safety licensing.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to rules governing plumbing safety licensing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | To Secretary of State | |
2010-03-26 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-24 | To enrol | |
2010-03-23 | to Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-23 | Black | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2010-02-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-25 | House intro | |
2010-02-24 | to House | |
2010-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-24 | Stegner | |
2010-02-24 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2010-02-24 | ADOPTED | |
2010-02-24 | 10th Ord | |
2010-02-23 | to 10th Ord | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-22 | to printing | |
2010-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-22 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SCR120.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SCR120.pdf |