ID SCR118 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Division of Building Safety relating to Rules Governing the Use of the National Electrical Code.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Division of Building Safety relating to Rules Governing the Use of the National Electrical Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Secretary of State | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 61-1-8 | |
2012-02-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Bus | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | House intro | |
2012-02-14 | to House | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | Tippets | |
2012-02-14 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-02-14 | ADOPTED | |
2012-02-14 | 10th Ord | |
2012-02-13 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-02-13 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-10 | to printing | |
2012-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-10 | Senate intro |